EP0081243 - Articulated test probe mechanism with fluid bearing in roll gap [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.1987 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BETHLEHEM STEEL CORPORATION 701 East Third Street Bethlehem Pennsylvania 18016 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/24] | For all designated states Bethlehem Steel Corporation 701 East Third Street Bethlehem Pennsylvania 18016 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Plante, Arcade J. Bridle Path Woods T-32 400 Bridle Path Road Bethlehem, PA., 18017 / US | [1983/24] | Representative(s) | Reichel, Wolfgang, et al 2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel Partnerschaft Schumannstrasse 27 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/24] | Reichel, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing., et al Reichel und Reichel Parkstrasse 13 D-60322 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 82111379.2 | 08.12.1982 | [1983/24] | Priority number, date | US19810328772 | 08.12.1981 Original published format: US 328772 | [1983/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0081243 | Date: | 15.06.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0081243 | Date: | 14.03.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/90, G01N29/00 | [1983/24] | CPC: |
G01N29/223 (EP,US);
G01N27/9093 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1983/24] | Title | German: | Testsonde mit Gelenkmechanismus und Kontaktfluid als Film zwischen Sonde und einer Walze | [1983/24] | English: | Articulated test probe mechanism with fluid bearing in roll gap | [1983/24] | French: | Sonde à mécanisme articulé avec un fluide de contact formant un film entre sonde et rouleau | [1983/24] | File destroyed: | 16.04.1993 | Examination procedure | 24.08.1984 | Examination requested [1984/44] | 23.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 29.05.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/20] | 15.12.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1987/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1986 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB839996 (TI GROUP SERVICES LTD); | [A]DE1573617 (J U H KRAUTKRAEMER GES F ELEKT); | [A]DE2603336 (DOMINION FOUNDRIES & STEEL); | [A]FR2373059 (KRAFTWERK UNION AG [DE]); | [A]EP0029070 (SUMITOMO METAL IND [JP]) |