EP0084640 - Apparatus for feeding the loading chamber of a horizontal ram extruder press with a composition of small vegetable particles and a binder for the production of hollow prismatic extruded profiles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.1986 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heggenstaller, Anton Mühlenstrasse 9 D-8891 Unterbernbach / DE | [1983/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1983/31] | Representative(s) | Ernicke, Hans-Dieter Patentanwälte Ernicke & Ernicke Schwibbogenplatz 2b 86153 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/31] | Ernicke, Hans-Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. Schwibbogenplatz 2b D-86153 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 82111424.6 | 09.12.1982 | [1983/31] | Priority number, date | DE19813150577 | 21.12.1981 Original published format: DE 3150577 | [1983/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0084640 | Date: | 03.08.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0084640 | Date: | 24.04.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B27N3/08 | [1985/17] | CPC: |
B27N5/02 (EP);
B30B15/302 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1983/31] | B29J5/06, B29F3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/31] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Beschicken des Füllraumes einer horizontalen Kolben-Strangpresse mit einem Gemisch aus pflanzlichen Kleinteilen und Bindemittel zur Herstellung hohlprismatischer Strangpressprofile | [1983/31] | English: | Apparatus for feeding the loading chamber of a horizontal ram extruder press with a composition of small vegetable particles and a binder for the production of hollow prismatic extruded profiles | [1983/31] | French: | Dispositif d'alimentation de la chambre de charge d'une presse extrudeuse horizontale à piston avec un mélange de petites particules végétales et un liant, pour la fabrication de profilés creux prismatiques extrudés | [1983/31] | Examination procedure | 23.08.1983 | Examination requested [1983/44] | 25.05.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.08.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.01.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.12.1985 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1012062 ; | [A]DE1050990 ; | [A]AT162232B (PESCHEK KARL DR); | [A]AT194123B (COLLIPRESS GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE2714256 (HEGGENSTALLER ANTON); | [AD]DE2810070 (HEGGENSTALLER ANTON); | [AD]DE2932406 (HEGGENSTALLER ANTON); | [A]DE2948082 (HEGGENSTALLER ANTON) |