EP0083003 - Aqueous preparation and its use in the preparation of ceramic masses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.1986 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.1986 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.07.1986 [1986/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/27] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Drinkuth, Franz Gruener Weg 6 D-5068 Odenthal 2 / DE | 02 /
von Bonin, Wulf, Dr. Mendelssohnstrasse 30 D-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | 03 /
Schäpel, Dietmar, Dr. Johanniterstrasse 15 D-5000 Koeln 80 / DE | 04 /
Lorenz, Artur Raiffeisenstrasse 2 D-7750 Konstanz-Litzelstetten / DE | [1983/27] | Application number, filing date | 82111459.2 | 10.12.1982 | [1983/27] | Priority number, date | DE19813151373 | 24.12.1981 Original published format: DE 3151373 | [1983/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0083003 | Date: | 06.07.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0083003 | Date: | 19.06.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C04B38/06, C08L75/08, // C08K5/01 ,(C08L75/08, 91:00) | [1985/25] | CPC: |
C08L75/08 (EP,US);
C04B38/0645 (EP,US);
C08K3/013 (EP,US);
C08K5/01 (EP,US);
C08L1/00 (EP,US);
C08L29/04 (EP,US);
C08L3/00 (EP,US);
C08L5/00 (EP,US);
C08L89/00 (EP,US);
C08L91/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/01, C08L75/08 (EP,US);
C08L75/08, C08L1/00, C08L3/00, C08L5/00, C08L29/04, C08L89/00, C08L91/00, C08K5/01, C08K3/013 (US,EP);
C08L75/08, C08L2666/02, C08L2666/28 (US,EP);
C08L75/08, C08L2666/26 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [1983/27] | C04B21/06, C08L75/08, // C08K5/01 ,(C08L75/08, 91:00) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1983/27] | Title | German: | Wässrige Zubereitung und ihre Verwendung bei der Herstellung keramischer Massen | [1983/27] | English: | Aqueous preparation and its use in the preparation of ceramic masses | [1983/27] | French: | Préparation aqueuse et son utilisation pour la préparation de masses céramiques | [1983/27] | Examination procedure | 10.12.1982 | Examination requested [1983/27] | 14.02.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 31.10.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.03.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 19.06.1985 | [1986/30] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1497665 (DOW CHEMICAL CO); | [A]US3390212 (STELLE RUSSELL T); | [A]DE2014948 ; | [X]FR2172590 (MIRANDA SALVATORE [US]) |