EP0083757 - Vitreous ceramic cooker hob plate with several single hotplates for built-in kitchen furniture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.1986 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Licentia Patent-Verwaltungs-GmbH Theodor-Stern-Kai 1 60596 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/29] | For all designated states Licentia Patent-Verwaltungs-GmbH Theodor-Stern-Kai 1 D-60596 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baumgartl, Manfred Josef-Fensterer-Strasse 3 D-8540 Schwabach / DE | 02 /
Rosenberger, Karl, Ing. (grad.) Muggenhofer Strasse 203 D-8500 Nürnberg / DE | [1983/29] | Representative(s) | Vogl, Leo Licentia Patent-Verwaltungs-G.m.b.H. Theodor-Stern-Kai 1 60596 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/29] | Vogl, Leo, Dipl.-Ing. Licentia Patent-Verwaltungs-G.m.b.H. Theodor-Stern-Kai 1 D-60596 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 82111617.5 | 14.12.1982 | [1983/29] | Priority number, date | DE19813150144 | 18.12.1981 Original published format: DE 3150144 | [1983/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0083757 | Date: | 20.07.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.1983 | Classification | IPC: | F24C15/10, A47B77/08 | [1983/29] | CPC: |
F24C15/108 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, FR, GB, IT [1983/29] | Title | German: | Einbaukochfläche aus Glaskeramik mit mehreren Einzelkochstellen für Einbauküchenmöbel | [1983/29] | English: | Vitreous ceramic cooker hob plate with several single hotplates for built-in kitchen furniture | [1983/29] | French: | Plaque de cuisson encastrée en vitrocéramique utilisant plusieurs plaques de cuisson individuelles pour meubles de cuisine intégrés | [1983/29] | File destroyed: | 03.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 11.01.1984 | Examination requested [1984/13] | 10.12.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/24] | 13.01.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1986/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2126614 ; | [X]EP0036190 ; | [A]DE7418347U ; | [XP]DE8136893U ; | [AP]DE8203381U |