EP0082470 - Upgrading method of low-rank coal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.1988 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/26] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yokoyama, Hiroshi 4069-3, Ogitsu-cho Hitachi-shi Ibaraki-ken / JP | 02 /
Kuge, Toshio 161-412, Ishinazaka-cho Hitachi-shi Ibaraki-ken / JP | 03 /
Nogita, Shunsuke 2-13-17, Mizuki-cho Hitachi-shi Ibaraki-ken / JP | 04 /
Nakamura, Yoichi 1921-2, Higashitoyoi Kudamatsu-shi Yamaguchi-ken / JP | [1983/26] | Representative(s) | von Füner, Alexander, et al v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Postfach 95 01 60 81517 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/26] | von Füner, Alexander, Dr., et al Patentanwälte v. Füner, Ebbinghaus, Finck, Postfach 95 01 60 D-81517 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82111623.3 | 14.12.1982 | [1983/26] | Priority number, date | JP19810203552 | 18.12.1981 Original published format: JP 20355281 | JP19820032390 | 03.03.1982 Original published format: JP 3239082 | [1983/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0082470 | Date: | 29.06.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0082470 | Date: | 24.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0082470 | Date: | 09.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C10F7/04, C10F5/00, C10L5/06 | [1984/43] | CPC: |
C10F7/04 (EP,US);
C10F5/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1984/43] | C10F7/04, C10F7/04, C10L5/06 | ||
Former IPC [1983/26] | C10F5/00, C10F7/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1983/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Aufbereitung von Kohle minderer Qualität | [1983/26] | English: | Upgrading method of low-rank coal | [1983/26] | French: | Procédé pour l'amélioration de charbon de qualité inférieure | [1983/26] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 14.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/10] | 03.02.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 06.10.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.03.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1984 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   05.02.1985 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 09.09.1987 | [2002/24] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2653033 (SHELL INT RESEARCH); | [AD]FR2372886 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) |