Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0088165 | ![]() | 12.03.1986 | B1 | EP0088165 | 14.09.1983 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3208197 | 06.03.1982 | DE8206324 | 06.03.1982 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE18492T | 15.03.1986 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP82111994 | 24.12.1982 | DE3208197 | 06.03.1982 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE8206324U | 30.09.1982 | U1 | Priority number | Date | DE3208197 | 06.03.1982 | DE8206324 | 06.03.1982 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3208197 | 06.10.1983 | C1 | Priority number | Date | DE3208197 | 06.03.1982 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES8401339 | 16.12.1983 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3208197 | 06.03.1982 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS6146092B | 13.10.1986 | B2 | JPS58198233 | 18.11.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3208197 | 06.03.1982 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4476808 | 16.10.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3208197 | 06.03.1982 |