Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Legal status: EP0088165

Designated contracting states AT 
 BE 
 CH 
FR 
GB 
 IT 
 LI 
 NL 
 SE 
Examination procedure02.09.1985Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.1985Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.1985Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.198403   M06   Fee paid on   27.02.1985
European patent granted12.03.1986
Opposition procedure13.12.1986No opposition filed within time limit published on 04.03.1987 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:18.07.1986 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:04.03.1987 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
 
Event date:31.12.1990 
Event description:IT: LAST PAID ANNUAL FEE
 
Event date:17.08.1992 
Event description:NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE
 
Event date:19.08.1992 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
 
Event date:14.09.1983 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Designated State(s):AT BE CH FR GB IT LI NL SE
 
Event date:12.03.1986 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH FR GB IT LI NL SE
 
Event date:14.09.1983 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19830113
 
Event date:12.03.1986 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:18492
Country of Ref Document:AT
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:19860315
Kind Code of Ref Document:T
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:13.03.1986 
Event description:IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED
 
Event date:30.04.1992 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE
 
Event date:31.08.1992 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:30.10.1992 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE
 
Event date:30.06.1992 
Event description:BE: LAPSED
OWNER:WESTFALIA SEPARATOR A.G.
Effective DATE:19911231
 
Event date:31.01.1995 
Event description:SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED
Ref Document Number:82111994.8
Effective DATE:19920704
Format of Ref Document F/P:F
 
Event date:24.12.1991 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Effective DATE:19911224
 
Event date:31.12.1991 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Effective DATE:19911231
 
Event date:31.12.1991 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Effective DATE:19911231
 
Event date:31.08.1992 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Effective DATE:19920831
 
Event date:24.12.1991 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Effective DATE:19911224
 
Event date:31.12.1991 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LI
Effective DATE:19911231
 
Event date:01.07.1992 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Effective DATE:19920701
 
Event date:25.12.1991 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Effective DATE:19911225
 
Event date:28.12.1990 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Payment DATE:19901228
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:14.11.1990 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:19901114
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:08.03.1991 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:19910308
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:31.10.1990 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:19901031
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:02.11.1990 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:19901102
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:31.12.1990 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:19901231
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:20.12.1990 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Payment DATE:19901220
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:24.01.1986 
Event description:(EXPECTED) GRANT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210
 
Event date:16.07.1983 
Event description:PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012
 
Event date:16.01.1987 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT
 
Event date:16.01.1987 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261