blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0088165

EP0088165 - Apparatus for the automatic flushing of milking installations [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.01.1987
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip16.01.1987No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.03.1987 [1987/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Westfalia Separator AG
Werner-Habig-Strasse 1
59302 Oelde / DE
[N/P]
Former [1983/37]For all designated states
Westfalia Separator AG
Werner-Habig-Strasse 1, Postfach 3720
D-59302 Oelde / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Meermöller, Theodor, Ing. grad.
Südstrasse 40
D-4740 Oelde 1 / DE
02 / Greshof, Heinrich
Zum Drostenholz 23
D-4740 Oelde 1 / DE
[1983/37]
Application number, filing date82111994.824.12.1982
[1983/37]
Priority number, dateDE1982320819706.03.1982         Original published format: DE 3208197
[1983/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0088165
Date:14.09.1983
Language:DE
[1983/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0088165
Date:12.03.1986
Language:DE
[1986/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.07.1983
ClassificationIPC:A01J7/00
[1983/37]
CPC:
A01J7/022 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1983/37]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur automatischen Spülung von Absaug-Melkanlagen[1983/37]
English:Apparatus for the automatic flushing of milking installations[1983/37]
French:Appareil de rinçage automatique pour installations de traite[1983/37]
Examination procedure13.01.1983Examination requested  [1983/37]
10.09.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.09.1984Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.05.1985Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
13.08.1985Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.09.1985Fee for grant paid
02.09.1985Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.12.1986No opposition filed within time limit [1987/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.1985Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.1985Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.198403   M06   Fee paid on   27.02.1985
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[AD]DE2335877  ;
 [A]DE1757520  ;
 [A]FR2351588  ;
 [A]CH399689
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.