EP0083450 - Working fluids for Rankine cycle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.1986 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.03.1986 [1986/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daikin Kogyo Co., Ltd. Shinhankyu Building No 1-12-39, Umeda Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/28] | For all designated states Daikin Kogyo Co., Ltd. Shinhankyu Building No 1-12-39, Umeda Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Enjo, Naonori 32/4, Tarumi 1-chome Suita-shi Osaka / JP | 02 /
Aomi, Hideki 7/1-310, Minamihorie 4-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | 03 /
Noguchi, Masahiro 14-A418, Sekime 6-chome Jyoto-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | [1983/28] | Representative(s) | Schüler, Horst Kaiserstrasse 69 D-6000 Frankfurt/Main 1 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/28] | Schüler, Horst, Dr. Kaiserstrasse 69 D-6000 Frankfurt/Main 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 82112067.2 | 28.12.1982 | [1983/28] | Priority number, date | JP19810215859 | 28.12.1981 Original published format: JP 21585981 | JP19820021814 | 12.02.1982 Original published format: JP 2181482 | JP19820021815 | 12.02.1982 Original published format: JP 2181582 | [1983/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0083450 | Date: | 13.07.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0083450 | Date: | 20.03.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C09K5/04, F01K25/08 | [1983/28] | CPC: |
F01K25/08 (EP,US);
C09K5/047 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1983/28] | Title | German: | Arbeitsflüssigkeiten für Rankine-Kreisprozess | [1983/28] | English: | Working fluids for Rankine cycle | [1983/28] | French: | Fluides de travail pour cycle de Rankine | [1983/28] | Examination procedure | 09.09.1983 | Examination requested [1983/47] | 25.04.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.06.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.12.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]GB2016607 (DAIKIN IND LTD); | [A]US3940939 (DAVIS JERRY P); | [A]GB1357947 (HALOCARBON PROD CORP) |