EP0057033 - Implantable prosthesis, in particular a mammary prosthesis and method for the manufacture thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.1985 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA SANTE ET DE LA RECHERCHE MEDICALE (INSERM) 101, rue de Tolbiac 75654 Paris Cédex 13 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/31] | For all designated states INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA SANTE ET DE LA RECHERCHE MEDICALE (INSERM) 101, rue de Tolbiac F-75654 Paris Cédex 13 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Feurer, Bernard 31 rue des Tourterelles F-31650 Saint Orens de Gameville / FR | 02 /
Chavoin, Jean-Pierre 17 avenue Honoré Serres F-31400 Toulouse / FR | 03 /
Baronet, Philippe 32 rue Alsace Lorraine F-31000 Toulouse / FR | 04 /
Morucci, Jean-Pierre 75 rue du Cagire F-31100 Toulouse / FR | [1982/31] | Representative(s) | Barre, Philippe Cabinet Barre Laforgue et associés 95 rue des Amidonniers 31000 Toulouse / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/31] | Barre, Philippe Cabinet Barre Laforgue et associés 95 rue des Amidonniers F-31000 Toulouse / FR | Application number, filing date | 82200046.9 | 15.01.1982 | [1982/31] | Priority number, date | FR19810001553 | 26.01.1981 Original published format: FR 8101553 | [1982/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0057033 | Date: | 04.08.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0057033 | Date: | 01.09.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0057033 | Date: | 21.11.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.1982 | Classification | IPC: | A61F1/00, C08J7/18 | [1982/31] | CPC: |
A61F2/12 (EP);
A61L27/18 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61L27/18, C08L83/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/31] | Title | German: | Implantierbare Prothese, insbesondere Brustprothese, und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1982/31] | English: | Implantable prosthesis, in particular a mammary prosthesis and method for the manufacture thereof | [1982/31] | French: | Prothèse destinée à être insérée dans des tissus vivants, en particulier prothèse mammaire et procédé de fabrication | [1984/47] |
Former [1982/31] | Prothèse destinée à être insérée dans les tissus vivants, en particulier prothèse mamaire et procédé de fabrication | Examination procedure | 25.02.1983 | Examination requested [1983/19] | 08.03.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.05.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.08.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.01.1985 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB860327 (MIDLAND SILICONES LTD); | [A]FR1526934 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE); | [A]FR2140560 (MERRILL EDWARD); | [A]FR2208775 (MERRILL EDWARD [US]); | [A]FR2251423 (HIGH VOLTAGE ENGINEERING CORP [US]); | [A]FR2352851 (DOW CORNING [US]); | [A]GB2051844 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO) |