EP0061788 - Method and apparatus for splicing packing material webs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.1985 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.08.1985 [1985/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEVOPHARM SCHIEDAM B.V. P.O. Box 35 Conradstraat 4 3100 AA Schiedam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1982/40] | For all designated states TEVOPHARM SCHIEDAM B.V. P.O. Box 35 Conradstraat 4 NL-3100 AA Schiedam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van Maanen, Johannes Dominicus Brahmsstraat 6 NL-2651 VK Berkel Rodenrijs / NL | [1982/40] | Representative(s) | van der Beek, George F., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS 's-Gravenhage / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1982/40] | van der Beek, George Frans, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 82200248.1 | 26.02.1982 | [1982/40] | Priority number, date | NL19810001588 | 31.03.1981 Original published format: NL 8101588 | [1982/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0061788 | Date: | 06.10.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0061788 | Date: | 15.08.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B65H19/10, B65H21/02, B65B41/18, B65B57/02 | [1982/40] | CPC: |
B65H19/1873 (EP,US);
B65B41/18 (EP,US);
B65B57/02 (EP,US);
B65H19/1831 (EP,US);
B65H21/02 (EP,US);
B65H2301/460183 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, LI, NL [1982/40] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Apparat zum Verbinden von Verpackungsmaterialbahnen | [1982/40] | English: | Method and apparatus for splicing packing material webs | [1982/40] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour raccorder des bandes de matériau d'emballage | [1982/40] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 23.02.1983 | Examination requested [1983/18] | 14.07.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.02.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.05.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3510036 (LEWIS CLARENCE A JR, et al); | [A]DE1235700 ; | [A]CH534920 (FERAG AG [CH]); | [A]DE1268466 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]US3335625 (ENGELBERT KLUTH); | [A]FR2088733 (GRYSPEERT RENE ETS); | [A]GB1516075 (GEN FOODS CORP) |