Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3262372D1 | 28.03.1985 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE3262372 | 22.03.1982 | DE3112749 | 31.03.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0062937 | Global Dossier | 20.02.1985 | B1 | EP0062937 | 20.10.1982 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3112749 | 31.03.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3112749 | 14.10.1982 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3112749 | 31.03.1981 |