EP0067459 - Silica particles and method for their preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 21.08.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/41] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [1982/51] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 NL-2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spek, Theo Gerard Badhuisweg 3 NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL | 02 /
Van Beem, Martinus Jan Lodewijk Badhuisweg 3 NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL | [1982/51] | Representative(s) | Aalbers, Onno, et al P.O. Box 162 2501 AN Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1985/04] | Aalbers, Onno, et al P.O. Box 162 NL-2501 AN The Hague / NL | ||
Former [1982/51] | Puister, Antonius Tonnis, Mr. P.O. Box 302 NL-2501 CH The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 82200382.8 | 29.03.1982 | [1982/51] | Priority number, date | GB19810011587 | 13.04.1981 Original published format: GB 8111587 | [1982/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0067459 | Date: | 22.12.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0067459 | Date: | 09.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/10] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0067459 | Date: | 07.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C01B33/16, B01J21/08 | [1982/51] | CPC: |
B01J21/08 (EP);
C01B33/16 (EP);
C07C29/04 (EP);
C07C31/08 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C29/04, C07C31/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1982/51] | Title | German: | Siliciumdioxidteilchen und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1982/51] | English: | Silica particles and method for their preparation | [1982/51] | French: | Particules en silice et procédé de production | [1982/51] | Examination procedure | 29.03.1982 | Examination requested [1982/51] | 30.01.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.08.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
30.11.1988
13.01.1989
ADMISSIBLE Eka Chemicals AB 445 80 Bohus / SE Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/47] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.11.1988
13.01.1989
ADMISSIBLE Eka Chemicals AB 445 01 Bohus / SE Opponent's representative VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/03] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.11.1988
13.01.1989
ADMISSIBLE EKA Nobel Aktiebolag Fack S-44501 Surte / SE Opponent's representative VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/04] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.11.1988
EKA Nobel Aktiebolag Fack S-44501 Surte / SE Opponent's representative Schöld, Zaid Nobel Industries Sweden AB Patent Department Box 11554 S-100 61 Stockholm / SE | 17.01.1989 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.05.1989 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 05.06.1989 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.1989 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 23.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 26.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 23.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 02.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 04.12.1997 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.01.1998 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 23.01.1998 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 02.02.1998 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 07.05.1998 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 01.07.1998 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 25.11.1992 | Appeal received No. T1066/92 | 26.01.1993 | Statement of grounds filed | 05.07.1995 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure | 23.11.1992 | Appeal received No. T1066/92 | 03.11.1994 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1994/45] | 02.01.1995 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1995/01] | 05.07.1995 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.07.1995 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2633198 (CESKOSLOVENSKA AKADEMIE VED); | [Y]DE2549411 (SHELL INT RESEARCH); | [Y]DE2719055 (SHELL INT RESEARCH); | [Y]DE2753393 (SHELL INT RESEARCH); | [A]DE2753392 (SHELL INT RESEARCH); | [A]DE2127649 ; | [AD]DE1266741 ; | [A]DE1792601 (BAYER AG) | [A] - IND. ENG. CHEM., PROD. RES. DEV., Vol. 14, No. 3, 1975, T.P. KOBYLINSKI et al.: "Porous Silica Beads-A Catalyst Support for Removal of Exhaust Gas Pollutants" pages 147 to 150 | by applicant | NL6914492 | DE2633198 | DE1266741 | - H.L. RITTER; L.C. DRAKE, Ind. Eng. Chem., (1945), page 787 | - A.I.CH.E. JOURNAL., (196811), page 886 | GB19810004631 |