EP0068545 - Metal alloys for making alloys with ultra-fine uniformly dispersed crystalline phase [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.09.1985 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLIED CORPORATION Columbia Road and Park Avenue P.O. Box 2245R (Law Dept.) Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/01] | For all designated states ALLIED CORPORATION Columbia Road and Park Avenue P.O. Box 2245R (Law Dept.) Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ray, Ranjan 5002 Stearns Hill Road Waltham Massachusetts 02154 / US | [1983/01] | Representative(s) | Myerscough, Philip Boyd, et al J.A.KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | [1983/01] | Application number, filing date | 82200698.7 | 21.03.1980 | [1983/01] | Priority number, date | US19790023379 | 23.03.1979 Original published format: US 23379 | [1983/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0068545 | Date: | 05.01.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0068545 | Date: | 13.04.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C22C1/00 | [1983/01] | CPC: |
C22C45/00 (EP,US);
B22F3/14 (EP,US);
B22F9/007 (EP,US);
C22C45/008 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1983/01] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung für die Herstellung von Legierungen mit ultrafeiner, und gleichmässig verteilter kristallinen Phasen | [1983/01] | English: | Metal alloys for making alloys with ultra-fine uniformly dispersed crystalline phase | [1983/01] | French: | Composition pour la fabrication d'alliages à phase cristalline ultra-fine et uniformément dispersée | [1983/01] | Examination procedure | 24.06.1982 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) LI | 04.09.1982 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.06.1983 | Examination requested [1983/33] | 09.10.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.04.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/48] | 04.06.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1985/48] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP80300895.2 / EP0018096 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.02.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]FR2211536 (ALLIED CHEM [US]); | [Y]FR2317370 (ALLIED CHEM [US]); | [YD]EP0002923 (ALLIED CHEM [US]) |