Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0068569
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
01.02.1990 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 21.03.1990 [1990/12] |
19.07.1989 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.09.1989 [1989/36] |
18.02.1989 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 05.04.1989 [1989/14] |
19.05.1988 |
Change - name/address |
published on 06.07.1988 [1988/27] |
26.01.1988 |
Change - representative |
published on 16.03.1988 [1988/11] |
02.09.1987 |
First examination report |
|
13.11.1985 |
Publication of search report |
published on 15.01.1986 [1986/03] |
30.09.1985 |
Change - classification |
published on 04.12.1985 [1985/49] |
23.08.1983 |
Change - applicant |
published on 26.10.1983 [1983/43] |
05.11.1982 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.01.1983 [1983/01] |
05.11.1982 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 05.01.1983 [1983/01] |