EP0070056 - Process for preparing thermally stable ammonium nitrate-containing granules of high bulk density [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 28.07.1988 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.1988 | Revocation of patent | published on 14.09.1988 [1988/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIE VAN KUNSTMESTFABRIEKEN B.V. Maliebaan 81 NL-3581 CG Utrecht / NL | [1983/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mutsers, Stanislaus Martinus Petrus Eindstraat 9 NL-6166 EH Geleen / NL | 02 /
Hoek, Cornelis R.van Gelrestraat 38 NL-6118 AD Nieuwstadt / NL | 03 /
Wagemans, Gerardus Mathias Cornelis Dopheide 8 NL-6081 CC Haelen / NL | [1983/03] | Representative(s) | Hoogstraten, Willem Cornelis R., et al DSM Patents & Trademarks Office Geleen Postbus 9 6160 MA Geleen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1986/44] | Hoogstraten, Willem Cornelis Roeland, et al OCTROOIBUREAU DSM Postbus 9 NL-6160 MA Geleen / NL | ||
Former [1983/03] | Roeffen, Wilhelmus Johannes Maria OCTROOIBUREAU DSM Postbus 9 NL-6160 MA Geleen / NL | Application number, filing date | 82200763.9 | 19.06.1982 | [1983/03] | Priority number, date | NL19810002960 | 19.06.1981 Original published format: NL 8102960 | [1983/03] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0070056 | Date: | 19.01.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0070056 | Date: | 11.09.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C05C1/02 | [1983/03] | CPC: |
C05C1/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1983/03] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Ammoniumnitrat enthaltenden, thermisch beständigen Körnern mit hohere Sturzdichte | [1983/03] | English: | Process for preparing thermally stable ammonium nitrate-containing granules of high bulk density | [1983/03] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de granules contenant du nitrate d'ammonium thermiquement stables et de haute densité en vrac | [1983/03] | Examination procedure | 30.06.1983 | Examination requested [1983/37] | 11.01.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.01.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.06.1986
13.08.1986
ADMISSIBLE Uhde GmbH Deggingstrasse 10-12 D-4600 Dortmund 1 / DE Opponent's representative Meinke, Dabringhaus und Partner GbR Postfach 10 46 45 44046 Dortmund / DE | 02
10.06.1986
13.08.1986
ADMISSIBLE Nederlandse Stikstof Maatschappij B.V. Industrieweg 10 5145 PV Sluiskil / NL Opponent's representative Hatzmann, Martin, et al, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1986/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.06.1986
13.08.1986
ADMISSIBLE Uhde GmbH Deggingstrasse 10-12 D-4600 Dortmund 1 / DE Opponent's representative Patentanwälte Meinke, Dabringhaus und Partner Postfach 10 46 45 D-44046 Dortmund / DE | ||
02
10.06.1986
13.08.1986
ADMISSIBLE Nederlandse Stikstof Maatschappij B.V. Industrieweg 10 NL-Sluiskil / NL Opponent's representative Hatzmann, Marinus Jan, et al, et al Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | |||
Former [1986/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.06.1986
13.08.1986
ADMISSIBLE Uhde GmbH Deggingstrasse 10-12 D-4600 Dortmund 1 / DE Opponent's representative Patentanwälte Meinke, Dabringhaus und Partner Postfach 10 46 45 D-44046 Dortmund / DE | 14.08.1986 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.12.1986 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.12.1986 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.1987 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 18.04.1988 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 28.04.1988 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1988/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]NL242422 ; | [A]NL268086 ; | [A]US1868890 (CARL EYER, et al); | [A]US1952849 (CARL EYER, et al); | [A]FR1309248 (MONSANTO CHEMICALS); | [AD]GB990487 (ICI LTD); | [A]BE675700 ; | [A]GB1060182 (ICI LTD); | [A]GB1136019 (ARMOUR & CO); | [X]FR2451351 (AZOTE SA CIE NEERLANDAISE [BE]) |