Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0068591 | Global Dossier | 25.09.1985 | B1 | EP0068591 | 14.03.1984 | A3 | EP0068591 | 05.01.1983 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US27909281 | 30.06.1981 | US36095382 | 23.03.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1199337 | 14.01.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | US27909281 | 30.06.1981 | US36095382 | 23.03.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3266541D1 | 31.10.1985 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US27909281 | 30.06.1981 | US36095382 | 23.03.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4401663 | 30.08.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | US27909281 | 30.06.1981 | US36095382 | 23.03.1982 |