EP0070583 - Heatpump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.1984 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.04.1984 [1984/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Van Dorst, Joannes Petrus Josephina Stationsstraat 119 B-2190 Essen / BE | [1983/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1983/04] | Application number, filing date | 82200799.3 | 28.06.1982 | [1983/04] | Priority number, date | BE19810889576 | 10.07.1981 Original published format: BE 889576 | [1983/04] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0070583 | Date: | 26.01.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.1982 | Classification | IPC: | F24J3/04, F24J3/02, F25B5/00 | [1983/04] | CPC: |
F25B5/02 (EP,US);
F24D11/02 (EP);
F24T10/10 (EP,US);
F24T10/30 (EP,US);
F25B30/06 (EP);
Y02E10/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1983/04] | Title | German: | Wärmepumpe | [1983/04] | English: | Heatpump | [1983/04] | French: | Pompe de chaleur | [1983/04] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 28.10.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1984/15] | 08.01.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1984/15] | 31.12.2099 | Examination requested [1983/52] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2931485 (OETJENGERDES RUDOLF); | [Y]FR893120 (HERMES PATENTVERWERTUNGS GMBH); | [A]FR1136296 (THOMSON HOUSTON COMP FRANCAISE); | [A]DE2216482 (BOSCH HAUSGERAETE GMBH); | [A]CH224584 (SULZER AG [CH]); | [AD]BE816093 ; | [A]GB638947 (ROBERT CORAN WEBBER); | [A]DE673899 (FRIEDRICH STAMP G M B H) | [A] - APPLIED ENERGY, volume 4, 1978, Applied Science Publishers Ltd.(GB) 1978 |