EP0072047 - Selective herbicidal agent and use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.1984 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORDDEUTSCHE AFFINERIE AG Postfach 10 48 40 D-20033 Hamburg / DE | [1983/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ploss, Hartmut, Dr. Sierichstrasse 88 D-2000 Hamburg 60 / DE | 02 /
Marzusch, Karl, Dr. Rehwinkel 3 D-2070 Grosshansdorf / DE | 03 /
Maierhofer, Franz, Dipl.-Landwirt Sebastian-Kneipp-Strasse 14 D-2210 Itzehoe / DE | [1983/07] | Representative(s) | Fischer, Ernst (DE) Reuterweg 14 D-60323 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/07] | Fischer, Ernst, Dr. Reuterweg 14 D-60323 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 82200843.9 | 06.07.1982 | [1983/07] | Priority number, date | DE19813129374 | 25.07.1981 Original published format: DE 3129374 | [1983/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0072047 | Date: | 16.02.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.1982 | Classification | IPC: | A01N33/22, A01N37/48, A01N43/70, A01N47/30, // (A01N33/22, 33:18),(A01N37/48, 33:18),(A01N43/70, 33:18),(A01N47/30, 33:18) | [1983/07] | CPC: |
A01N37/48 (EP);
A01N33/22 (EP);
A01N43/70 (EP);
A01N47/30 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A01N33/22, A01N2300/00 (EP);
A01N33/22, A01N33/18 (EP);
A01N37/48, A01N2300/00 (EP);
A01N37/48, A01N33/18 (EP);
A01N43/70, A01N2300/00 (EP);
A01N43/70, A01N33/18 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/07] | Title | German: | Mittel zur selektiven Unkrautbekämpfung und seine Anwendung | [1983/07] | English: | Selective herbicidal agent and use thereof | [1983/07] | French: | Agent herbicide sélectif et son application | [1983/07] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 17.11.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1984/17] | 30.01.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1984/17] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1348428 ; | [X]FR2414870 ; | [X]FR2414873 ; | [X]FR2432838 ; | [X]FR2432839 ; | [X]FR2437786 |