EP0070603 - Synchronizing circuit arrangement for a television receiver [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.1985 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.11.1985 [1985/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1983/04] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nillesen, Anthonius Hendrikus H. J. c/o Int. Octrooibureau BV. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1983/04] | Representative(s) | Minczeles, Roger, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1983/04] | Application number, filing date | 82200901.5 | 15.07.1982 | [1983/04] | Priority number, date | NL19810003437 | 21.07.1981 Original published format: NL 8103437 | [1983/04] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0070603 | Date: | 26.01.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0070603 | Date: | 21.11.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.1982 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/12, H04N9/44 | [1983/04] | CPC: |
H04N5/12 (EP,US);
H04N5/04 (KR);
H04N9/44 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1983/04] | Title | German: | Synchronisierschaltungsanordnung für einen Fernsehempfänger | [1983/04] | English: | Synchronizing circuit arrangement for a television receiver | [1983/04] | French: | Circuit de synchronisation pour un récepteur de télévision | [1984/47] |
Former [1983/04] | Arrangement d'un circuit de synchronisation pour un récepteur de télévision | Examination procedure | 15.07.1982 | Examination requested [1983/04] | 19.09.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.02.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.08.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2517046 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]FR2391620 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [A]US4203135 (SASAKI TAKASHI [JP]) |