EP0080744 - Screw drive for wedge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.1986 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.01.1987 [1987/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BBC Aktiengesellschaft Brown, Boveri & Cie. Haselstrasse CH-5401 Baden / CH | [1983/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meylan, Pierre Glärnischstrasse 19 CH-5432 Neuenhof / CH | [1983/23] | Application number, filing date | 82201279.5 | 14.10.1982 | [1983/23] | Priority number, date | CH19810007642 | 30.11.1981 Original published format: CH 764281 | [1983/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0080744 | Date: | 08.06.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0080744 | Date: | 05.02.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.1983 | Classification | IPC: | F16H25/20 | [1983/23] | CPC: |
B23Q1/58 (EP);
F16H25/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1983/23] | Title | German: | Schraubantrieb für Keilschuh | [1983/23] | English: | Screw drive for wedge | [1983/23] | French: | Commande à vis pour coin | [1983/23] | Examination procedure | 15.09.1983 | Examination requested [1983/47] | 24.07.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.05.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.11.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE507583 ; | [A]FR1099580 ; | [A]CH84126 |