EP0077592 - Method for the preventive and/or curative treatment of plants, and composition for application of this method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.1988 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states De Troyer, Paul Rue Raymond Leblaux 113 B-1428 Lillois / BE | [1983/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1983/17] | Representative(s) | Callant, Marc Voldersstraat 42 B-9000 Gent / BE | [2004/44] |
Former [1987/27] | Callant, Marc Voldersstraat 42 B-9000 Gent / BE | ||
Former [1984/40] | Donné, Eddy M.F.J.Bockstael Arenbergstraat 13 B-2000 Anvers / BE | ||
Former [1983/17] | Bockstael, Daniel M.F.J. Bockstael Arenbergstraat 13 B-2000 Anvers / BE | Application number, filing date | 82201294.4 | 18.10.1982 | [1983/17] | Priority number, date | BE19812059426 | 21.10.1981 Original published format: BE 2059426 | [1983/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0077592 | Date: | 27.04.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.1983 | Classification | IPC: | A01N61/00 | [1983/17] | CPC: |
A01N61/00 (EP);
A01N59/16 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A01N59/16, A01N2300/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1983/17] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur vorbeugenden und/oder kurativen Behandlung von Pflanzen und Zusammensetzung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens | [1983/17] | English: | Method for the preventive and/or curative treatment of plants, and composition for application of this method | [1983/17] | French: | Procédé de traitement préventif et/ou curatif de plantes et composition pour l'application de ce procédé | [1983/17] | Examination procedure | 19.04.1983 | Examination requested [1983/26] | 22.12.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.02.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.08.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.05.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/33] | 18.06.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1988/33] | Appeal following examination | 21.04.1987 | Appeal received No. J0025/87 | 23.06.1987 | Statement of grounds filed | 23.03.1988 | Result of appeal procedure: rejection of appeal | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1985 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   02.06.1986 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO7900838 ; | [A]US3973032 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 45, no. 1, 10 janvier 1951, col. 216c, Columbus Ohio (USA); | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS; vol. 48, no. 1, 10 janvier 1954, col. 777b, Columbus Ohio (USA); |