EP0079637 - Anti-srs-a carboxylic acid derivatives, processes for their production, and pharmaceutical formulation containing them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.1987 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 22.03.1989 [1989/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FISONS plc Fison House Princes Street Ipswich Suffolk IP1 1QH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/21] | For all designated states FISONS plc Fison House Princes Street Ipswich Suffolk IP1 1QH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bantick, John Raymond 6 Huntingdon Close Burton-on-the-Wolds Loughborough Leicestershire / GB | [1983/21] | Representative(s) | Craig, Christopher Bradberry, et al Fisons plc 12 Derby Road Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 0BB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/21] | Craig, Christopher Bradberry, et al Fisons plc 12 Derby Road Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 0BB / GB | Application number, filing date | 82201368.6 | 01.11.1982 | [1983/21] | Priority number, date | GB19810034186 | 12.11.1981 Original published format: GB 8134186 | [1983/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0079637 | Date: | 25.05.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0079637 | Date: | 28.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C07D311/24, C07D311/22, C07D215/22, C07D215/48, C07D335/06, A61K31/35, A61K31/38, A61K31/47 | [1983/21] | CPC: |
C07D215/233 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
C07C323/00 (EP,US);
C07D215/48 (EP,US);
C07D311/22 (EP,US);
C07D311/24 (EP,US);
C07D335/06 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/21] | Title | German: | Anti srs-a Carbonsäure-Derivate, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung und diese enthaltende pharmazeutische Formulierungen | [1983/21] | English: | Anti-srs-a carboxylic acid derivatives, processes for their production, and pharmaceutical formulation containing them | [1983/21] | French: | Dérivés d'acide carboxylique anti-srs-a, leurs procédés de production et formulation pharmaceutique les contenant | [1983/21] | Examination procedure | 18.11.1982 | Examination requested [1983/21] | 08.11.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.05.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.01.1987 | NL | 28.01.1987 | [1989/12] |
Former [1988/43] | NL | 28.01.1987 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR3996M ; | [A]FR2034538 (FISONS PHARMACEUTICALS LTD); | [Y]FR2147287 (FISONS LTD); | [Y]FR2189063 (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]); | [Y]US3953604 (WARREN BRIAN THOMAS, et al); | [A]FR2293202 (FISONS LTD [GB]); | [Y]GB1457255 (MILES LAB); | [Y]GB1583691 (FISONS LTD); | [Y]EP0017332 |