EP0079102 - Coloured aqueous alkalimetal hypochlorite compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 30.10.1992 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [1983/20] | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Foxlee, John Clifford Rose Cottage Cilcain near Mold Clwyd, North Wales / GB | [1983/20] | Representative(s) | Ford, Michael Frederick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London ECV 8AS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/20] | Ford, Michael Frederick, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [1992/17] | Elliott, Peter William Unilever plc Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [1989/28] | Thomas, Susan Margaret UNILEVER PLC Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook GB-Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [1988/44] | Tan, Bian An, Ir. Unilever N.V. Patent Division P.O. Box 137 NL-3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | ||
Former [1983/20] | van Gent, Jan Paulus Unilever N.V., Patent Division Postbus 137 NL-3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | Application number, filing date | 82201377.7 | 03.11.1982 | [1983/20] | Priority number, date | GB19810033538 | 06.11.1981 Original published format: GB 8133538 | [1983/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0079102 | Date: | 18.05.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0079102 | Date: | 04.09.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/36] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0079102 | Date: | 16.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/395, C11D3/40 | [1983/20] | CPC: |
C11D3/40 (EP,US);
C11D3/3956 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/20] | Title | German: | Gefärbte wässrige Alkalimetallhypochlorit-Zusammensetzungen | [1983/20] | English: | Coloured aqueous alkalimetal hypochlorite compositions | [1983/20] | French: | Compositions colorées aqueuses d'hypochlorite de métal alcalin | [1983/20] | Examination procedure | 01.06.1983 | Examination requested [1983/33] | 13.07.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.02.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.04.1986
05.07.1986
ADMISSIBLE Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien TFP / Patentabteilung D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/23] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.04.1986
05.07.1986
ADMISSIBLE Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien TFP / Patentabteilung D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | 08.07.1986 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.11.1986 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.12.1986 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.1987 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 08.09.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.1988 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 25.01.1990 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 08.04.1992 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 26.06.1992 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 28.09.1992 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 23.03.1990 | Appeal received No. T0228/90 | 08.04.1992 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 08.04.1992 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.04.1992 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.11.1987 | BE | 30.11.1987 | [1991/51] |
Former [1989/13] | AT | 03.11.1987 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1335360 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO); | [A]FR2318924 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]); | [A]DE2849225 (UNILEVER NV); | [A]FR2409303 (UNILEVER NV [NL]) |