blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0080749

EP0080749 - Liquid detergent compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.02.1987
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip19.02.1987No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 08.04.1987 [1987/15]
Applicant(s)For:GB 
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
301 East Sixth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
For:BE  DE  FR  IT  NL 
Procter & Gamble European Technical Center
Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
[N/P]
Former [1983/23]For:GB 
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
301 East Sixth Street
Cincinnati Ohio 45202 / US
For:BE  DE  FR  IT  NL 
Procter & Gamble European Technical Center
Temselaan 100
B-1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
Inventor(s)01 / König, Axel
117 De Ridderlaan
B-1810 Wemmel / BE
[1983/23]
Representative(s)Ernst, Hubert, et al
PROCTER & GAMBLE
EUROPEAN TECHNICAL CENTER
Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
[N/P]
Former [1983/23]Ernst, Hubert, et al
PROCTER & GAMBLE EUROPEAN TECHNICAL CENTER Temselaan 100
B-1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
Application number, filing date82201396.708.11.1982
[1983/23]
Priority number, dateGB1981003406012.11.1981         Original published format: GB 8134060
[1983/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0080749
Date:08.06.1983
Language:EN
[1983/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0080749
Date:16.04.1986
Language:EN
[1986/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.03.1983
ClassificationIPC:C11D3/20, C11D3/50, C11D17/00
[1983/23]
CPC:
C11D3/188 (EP); C11D3/2051 (EP); C11D3/50 (EP);
C11D3/2024 (EP); C11D3/2037 (EP)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1983/23]
TitleGerman:Flüssige Detergenszusammensetzungen[1983/23]
English:Liquid detergent compositions[1983/23]
French:Compositions détergentes liquides[1983/23]
Examination procedure26.11.1983Examination requested  [1984/05]
28.09.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.01.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.06.1985Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
10.10.1985Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.12.1985Fee for grant paid
31.12.1985Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.01.1987No opposition filed within time limit [1987/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.11.1984Renewal fee patent year 03
09.11.1985Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[APD]EP0040882  ;
 [AD]GB1308190  ;
 [AP]GB1603047
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.