EP0109462 - A hydraulic piston cylinder apparatus, particularly for a pivotable cab of a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 16.01.1987 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Power Inc. 250 Executive Drive Brookfield Wisconsin 53005 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/22] | For all designated states Applied Power Inc. 250 Executive Drive Brookfield Wisconsin 53005 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sonneborn, Lambertus Johannes Waterhamskamp 15 7576 EM Oldenzaal / NL | [1984/22] | Representative(s) | Boelsma, Gerben Harm Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1984/22] | Boelsma, Gerben Harm, Ir. van Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241 NL-2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 82201462.7 | 30.11.1982 | [1984/35] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0109462 | Date: | 30.05.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B62D33/06 | [1984/22] | CPC: |
B62D33/07 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/22] | Title | German: | Hydraulischer Kolbenzylinder, insbesondere für eine schwenkbare Kabine eines Motorfahrzeugs | [1984/22] | English: | A hydraulic piston cylinder apparatus, particularly for a pivotable cab of a motor vehicle | [1984/22] | French: | Cylindre-piston hydraulique, notamment pour une cabine basculante d'un véhicule à moteur | [1984/22] | File destroyed: | 16.04.1993 | Examination procedure | 29.11.1983 | Examination requested [1984/35] | 28.07.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.04.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1987/10] | 03.10.1986 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1987/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2945585 ; | [A]GB2079378 ; | [A]DE1815371 ; | [AD]DE2030450 ; | [AD]NL161401C |