Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0081878 | Global Dossier | 03.08.1983 | A3 | EP0081878 | 22.06.1983 | A2 | Priority number | Date | IT2551581 | 11.12.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IT1140326 | 24.09.1986 | B | Priority number | Date | IT2551581 | 11.12.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS58111683 | 02.07.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | IT2551581 | 11.12.1981 |