EP0081878 - Method for producing cells containing cholesterol oxidase [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 16.07.1986 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ANIC S.p.A. Via Ruggero Settimo, 55 90139 Palermo / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1983/25] | For all designated states ANIC S.p.A. Via Ruggero Settimo, 55 I-90139 Palermo / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zaffaroni, Pasquale Via Reatina 113 I-00013 Mentana (Rome) / IT | 02 /
Lucchese, Giuseppe Via F.lli Bandiera 23 I-00015 Monterontondo (Rome) / IT | 03 /
Gubbiotti, Angelo Via Galvani 20 I-05100 Terni / IT | [1983/25] | Representative(s) | Roggero, Sergio, et al Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 I-20121 Milano / IT | [1983/25] | Application number, filing date | 82201550.9 | 06.12.1982 | [1983/25] | Priority number, date | IT19810025515 | 11.12.1981 Original published format: IT 2551581 | [1983/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0081878 | Date: | 22.06.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0081878 | Date: | 03.08.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/04, C12R1/06 | [1983/25] | CPC: |
C12N9/0006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/25] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Cholesterinoxidase enthaltenden Zellen | [1983/25] | English: | Method for producing cells containing cholesterol oxidase | [1983/25] | French: | Procédé pour la production de cellules contenant de la cholestéroloxydase | [1983/25] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | File destroyed: | 03.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 04.11.1983 | Examination requested [1984/03] | 16.08.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.01.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.09.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1986/36] | 22.12.1985 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1986/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP7667786 ; | [XD]GB1577425 (SNAM PROGETTI); | [A]EP0021311 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACT, vol. 85, no. 19, 08 November 1976, page 393, no. 141331a, Columbus Ohio (US); & JP - A - 76 67 786 (NAGASE AND CO., LTD.) (11-06-1976), & JP7667786 A 19761108 |