EP0082555 - Process for the production of hydrocarbon oil distillates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.09.1986 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.11.1986 [1986/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1983/26] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 NL-2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van Dongen, Robert H. Badhuisweg 3 NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL | 02 /
Stork, Willem H. J. Badhuisweg 3 NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL | [1983/26] | Representative(s) | Aalbers, Onno, et al P.O. Box 162 2501 AN Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1985/03] | Aalbers, Onno, et al P.O. Box 162 NL-2501 AN The Hague / NL | ||
Former [1983/26] | Puister, Antonius Tonnis, Mr. P.O. Box 302 NL-2501 CH The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 82201567.3 | 09.12.1982 | [1983/26] | Priority number, date | NL19810005660 | 16.12.1981 Original published format: NL 8105660 | [1983/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0082555 | Date: | 29.06.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0082555 | Date: | 21.11.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C10G69/06, C10G67/04 | [1983/26] | CPC: |
C10G67/0463 (EP,US);
C10G2300/107 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1983/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Kohlenwasserstoff-Öl-Destillaten | [1983/26] | English: | Process for the production of hydrocarbon oil distillates | [1983/26] | French: | Procédé pour la production de distillats d'hydrocarbures | [1983/26] | Examination procedure | 09.12.1982 | Examination requested [1983/26] | 25.07.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.05.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.08.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3730875 [ ] (GLEIM W, et al); | GB1440363 [ ] (UOP INC); | GB2077186 [ ] (HOLSON CO); | GB2093477 [ ] (CHIYODA CHEM ENG CONSTRUCT CO) |