EP0108839 - Litter container for faeces disposal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.06.1985 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.08.1985 [1985/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZWIEHOFF, Mechthild Reichberg 29 D-7827 Löffingen / DE | [1984/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/21] | Representative(s) | Riebling, Günter, et al Patentanwalt Dr.-Ing. P. Riebling, Postfach 31 60 88113 Lindau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/21] | Riebling, Günter, Dr., et al Patentanwalt Dr.-Ing. P. Riebling, Postfach 31 60 D-88113 Lindau / DE | Application number, filing date | 82201578.0 | 10.11.1982 | [1984/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0108839 | Date: | 23.05.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.1983 | Classification | IPC: | A01K1/01, B65D81/36 | [1984/21] | CPC: |
B65D81/36 (EP);
A01K1/0125 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | IT [1984/21] | Title | German: | Behälter zur Aufnahme von Einstreumaterial zur Fäkalienbeseitigung | [1984/21] | English: | Litter container for faeces disposal | [1984/21] | French: | Récipient pour litière pour l'élimination des déjections | [1984/21] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 26.02.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1985/33] | 10.05.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/33] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 23.11.1984 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1984 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8100504 ; | [A]US3626900 ; | [A]DE2754620 ; | [A]FR632539 ; | [A]US3227137 |