blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0082576

EP0082576 - A process for the hydroformylation of olefins [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.12.1985
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip19.12.1985No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.02.1986 [1986/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V.
Carel van Bylandtlaan 30
2596 HR Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [1983/26]For all designated states
SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V.
Carel van Bylandtlaan 30
NL-2596 HR Den Haag / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Van Leeuwen, Petrus W. N. M.
Badhuisweg 3
NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL
02 / Roobeek, Cornelis F.
Badhuisweg 3
NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL
[1983/26]
Representative(s)Aalbers, Onno, et al
P.O. Box 162
2501 AN Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [1985/03]Aalbers, Onno, et al
P.O. Box 162
NL-2501 AN The Hague / NL
Former [1983/26]Puister, Antonius Tonnis, Mr.
P.O. Box 302
NL-2501 CH The Hague / NL
Application number, filing date82201634.120.12.1982
[1983/26]
Priority number, dateGB1981003873423.12.1981         Original published format: GB 8138734
[1983/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0082576
Date:29.06.1983
Language:EN
[1983/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0082576
Date:20.02.1985
Language:EN
[1985/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.03.1983
ClassificationIPC:C07C45/50, C07C29/16, C07C47/02, B01J31/24
[1983/26]
CPC:
B01J31/2495 (EP,US); B01J31/1875 (EP,US); B01J31/2404 (EP,US);
C07C45/50 (EP,US); B01J2231/321 (EP,US); B01J2531/828 (EP,US);
B01J31/18 (EP,US); B01J31/226 (EP,US); B01J31/2291 (EP,US);
B01J31/2295 (EP,US) (-)
C-Set:
C07C45/50, C07C47/02 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1983/26]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Hydroformylierung von Olefinen[1983/26]
English:A process for the hydroformylation of olefins[1983/26]
French:Procédé pour l'hydroformylation d'oléfines[1983/26]
Examination procedure20.12.1982Examination requested  [1983/26]
20.03.1984Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
08.06.1984Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.06.1984Fee for grant paid
25.06.1984Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.11.1985No opposition filed within time limit [1986/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.11.1984Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2428021  (KURARAY CO [JP]);
 [A]US3876672  (MROWCA JOSEPH J)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.