EP0083818 - Electrode for realizing contact with a liquid, such as a redox electrode and redox measuring apparatus provided with a suchlike electrode [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.1988 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.03.1988 [1988/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yokogawa Electrofact B.V. Radiumweg 30 NL-3812 RA Amersfoort / NL | [1986/37] |
Former [1983/29] | For all designated states Electrofact B.V. Radiumweg 30 NL-3812 RA Amersfoort / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Jong, Hendrik Prinsenhof 18 NL-3871 DB Hoevelaken / NL | [1983/29] | Representative(s) | de Wit, Gerard Frederik, et al Octrooi- en Merkenbureau de Wit B.V. Breitnerlaan 146 NL-2596 HG Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1983/29] | de Wit, Gerard Frederik, Ir., et al Octrooi- en Merkenbureau de Wit B.V. Breitnerlaan 146 NL-2596 HG Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 82201660.6 | 24.12.1982 | [1983/29] | Priority number, date | NL19820000007 | 05.01.1982 Original published format: NL 8200007 | [1983/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0083818 | Date: | 20.07.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0083818 | Date: | 17.08.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0083818 | Date: | 08.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/52, G01N27/28 | [1983/33] | CPC: |
G01N27/36 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1983/29] | G01N27/52 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/29] | Title | German: | Elektrode zur Kontaktherstellung mit einer Flüssigkeit wie eine Redoxelektrode, und Redoxmess-Apparat, versehen mit einer solchen Elektrode | [1983/29] | English: | Electrode for realizing contact with a liquid, such as a redox electrode and redox measuring apparatus provided with a suchlike electrode | [1983/29] | French: | Electrode pour établir un contact avec un liquide, telle une électrode rédox et appareil de mesure rédox muni d'une telle électrode | [1983/29] | Examination procedure | 17.11.1983 | Examination requested [1984/04] | 07.05.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.02.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.07.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.01.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB904457 (WERNER INGOLD); | [Y]DE2006682 (BECKMAN INSTRUMENTS INC [US]); | [Y]DE1773821 (IBM); | [A]US4218299 (LINDELL GROVER F [US], et al); | [Y]EP0036171 (CORDIS EUROP [NL]) | Examination | - "Glass electrodes for Hydrogen and other Cations", edited by George Eisenmann Marcel Dokka, Inc., New-York, 1967, pages 100-132, 175-222 |