EP0057559 - A disposable feeding bottle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.10.1984 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.1985 [1985/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Escolies Bordoy, Juan Bajada de la Gloria, 47 Barcelona / ES | For all designated states Mullerat Martin, Ricardo Portell, 11-13 Barcelona / ES | [1982/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1982/32] | Representative(s) | Carpenter, David, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/32] | Carpenter, David, et al MARKS & CLERK, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 82300387.6 | 26.01.1982 | [1982/32] | Priority number, date | ES19810256268 | 29.01.1981 Original published format: ES 256268 | ES19810256269 | 29.01.1981 Original published format: ES 256269 | ES19810257144 | 26.03.1981 Original published format: ES 257144 | [1982/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0057559 | Date: | 11.08.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.1982 | Classification | IPC: | A61J9/00 | [1982/32] | CPC: |
A61J9/005 (EP);
A61J11/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/32] | Title | German: | Einwegsaugflasche | [1982/32] | English: | A disposable feeding bottle | [1982/32] | French: | Biberon à jeter après usage | [1982/32] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 09.02.1983 | Examination requested [1983/17] | 09.02.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/01] | 19.07.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1985/01] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1984 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3871542 [ ]; | US1344760 [ ]; | US3097757 [ ]; | DE2444870 [ ]; | US2939598 [ ] |