EP0057574 - Multistage thermostat [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.08.1983 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis, MN 55408 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/32] | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis Minnesota 55408 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Benton, Ronald 5215 Zenith Avenue South Minneapolis Minnesota 55410 / US | [1982/32] | Representative(s) | Harman, Michael Godfrey, et al Honeywell Control Systems Ltd. Patent Department Charles Square Bracknell Berkshire RG12 1EB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/32] | Harman, Michael Godfrey, et al Honeywell Control Systems Ltd. Patent Department Charles Square Bracknell Berkshire RG12 1EB / GB | Application number, filing date | 82300446.0 | 28.01.1982 | [1982/32] | Priority number, date | US19810229689 | 30.01.1981 Original published format: US 229689 | [1982/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0057574 | Date: | 11.08.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.1982 | Classification | IPC: | G05D23/19 | [1982/32] | CPC: |
G05B11/18 (EP);
F24D11/0271 (EP);
G05D23/1912 (EP);
Y02A30/60 (EP);
Y02B10/70 (EP);
Y02B30/13 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, SE [1982/32] | Title | German: | Mehrpunktthermostat | [1982/32] | English: | Multistage thermostat | [1982/32] | French: | Thermostat à phases successives multiples | [1982/32] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 11.05.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1983/42] | 23.07.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1983/42] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2515147 [ ] (MESS & REGELUNGST VEB K); | GB879381 [ ] (TERMOSTATIK AB); | CH377562 [ ] (STONE & COMPANY DEPTFORD LIMIT [GB]); | FR2451548 [ ] (TOTALGAZ CIE FSE); | EP0007497 [ ] (CARRIER CORP [US]); | DE2510992 [ ] (HYDROTHERM GERAETEBAU GMBH) |