EP0059554 - Beta-lactam antibiotics, a process for their preparation and their use in pharmaceutical compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.1984 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BEECHAM GROUP PLC Beecham House, Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/36] | For all designated states BEECHAM GROUP PLC Beecham House Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Coulton, Steven 6 Badgers Close Horsham W. Sussex / GB | [1982/36] | Representative(s) | Hesketh, Alan, et al European Patent Attorney Beecham Pharmaceuticals Great Burgh Yew Tree Bottom Road Epsom, Surrey, KT18 5XQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/36] | Hesketh, Alan, Dr., et al European Patent Attorney Beecham Pharmaceuticals Great Burgh Yew Tree Bottom Road Epsom, Surrey, KT18 5XQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 82300798.4 | 17.02.1982 | [1982/36] | Priority number, date | GB19810006358 | 27.02.1981 Original published format: GB 8106358 | GB19810018107 | 12.06.1981 Original published format: GB 8118107 | [1982/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0059554 | Date: | 08.09.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0059554 | Date: | 20.10.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, A61K31/40, // (C07D487/04, 209:00, 205:00) | [1982/36] | CPC: |
C07D477/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/36] | Title | German: | Beta-Lactam-Antibiotika, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung in pharmazeutischen Zubereitungen | [1982/36] | English: | Beta-lactam antibiotics, a process for their preparation and their use in pharmaceutical compositions | [1982/36] | French: | Antibiotiques bêta-lactame, un procédé pour leur préparation et leur application en compositions pharmaceutiques | [1982/36] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 23.11.1982 | Examination requested [1983/06] | 06.06.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.01.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.06.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/02] | 01.08.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1985/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2751624 ; | [Y]EP0001628 ; | [Y]EP0017992 |