EP0059601 - Rotary high power transmission arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.1986 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.1987 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 27.01.1988 [1988/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S.S.S. PATENTS LIMITED Park Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/36] | For all designated states S.S.S. PATENTS LIMITED Park Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Clements, Herbert Arthur Berachah Shores Road Woking / GB | [1982/36] | Representative(s) | Miller, Joseph, et al J. MILLER & CO. 34 Bedford Row, Holborn London WC1R 4JH / GB | [1982/36] | Application number, filing date | 82300953.5 | 24.02.1982 | [1982/36] | Priority number, date | GB19810006690 | 03.03.1981 Original published format: GB 8106690 | [1982/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0059601 | Date: | 08.09.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0059601 | Date: | 26.06.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.1982 | Classification | IPC: | F16D23/10, F16H5/38 | [1982/36] | CPC: |
F16D23/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/36] | Title | German: | Hochleistungsfähige rotierende Getriebeanordnung | [1982/36] | English: | Rotary high power transmission arrangement | [1982/36] | French: | Arrangement pour une transmission rotative de haute puissance | [1982/36] | Examination procedure | 12.01.1983 | Examination requested [1983/12] | 10.11.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.12.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.03.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 26.06.1985 | [1988/04] | Documents cited: | Search | GB1172982 [ ] (AUTO TRANSMISSIONS LTD [GB]); | DE1180627 [ ]; | GB1291773 [ ] (SSS PATENTS LTD [GB]); | US4053038 [ ] (HERRICK ROLLAND CLYDE) |