Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0061854
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
31.10.1991 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.1991 [1991/51] |
11.04.1989 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.05.1989 [1989/22] |
07.01.1989 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.02.1989 [1989/08] |
05.06.1986 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 23.07.1986 [1986/30] |
24.05.1985 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 24.07.1985 [1985/30] |
18.03.1983 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.05.1983 [1983/20] |
09.08.1982 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.10.1982 [1982/40] |