Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE14384T | 15.08.1985 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP82301252 | 11.03.1982 | FI810965 | 27.03.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0061854 | Global Dossier | 24.07.1985 | B1 | EP0061854 | 06.10.1982 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FI810965 | 27.03.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3264839D1 | 29.08.1985 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FI810965 | 27.03.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI61999C | 10.11.1982 | C | FI61999B | 30.07.1982 | B | Priority number | Date | FI810965 | 27.03.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS57174101 | 26.10.1982 | A | Priority number | Date | FI810965 | 27.03.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4421605 | 20.12.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | FI810965 | 27.03.1981 |