EP0061350 - Method of forming pattern [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.1987 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.09.1987 [1987/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1982/39] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mochiji, Kozo 77-26, Fujimicho-6-chome Tachikawa-shi / JP | 02 /
Wada, Yasuo 14-5, Otsuka-6-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Ohyu, Kiyonori 19-7, Fujimidaira-2-chome Hamuramachi Nishitama-gun Tokyo / JP | [1982/39] | Representative(s) | Goldin, Douglas Michael, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/23] | Goldin, Douglas Michael, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | ||
Former [1982/39] | Overin, Alison Diana J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5EU / GB | Application number, filing date | 82301537.5 | 24.03.1982 | [1982/39] | Priority number, date | JP19810042317 | 25.03.1981 Original published format: JP 4231781 | [1982/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0061350 | Date: | 29.09.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0061350 | Date: | 17.09.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.1982 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/308, H05K3/00, G03F7/26 | [1982/39] | CPC: |
G03F7/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1982/39] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Mustern | [1982/39] | English: | Method of forming pattern | [1982/39] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication de dessins | [1982/39] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 29.01.1983 | Examination requested [1983/15] | 03.05.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.03.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.06.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | WO8001978 [ ]; | DE2748401 [ ]; | DE2723933 [ ]; | US4133907 [ ]; | DE2302116 [ ]; | US3880684 [ ]; | DE2504500 [ ]; | DE2635066 [ ]; | DE2930290 [ ]; | DE2625870 [ ]; | DE2730483 [ ] | [ ] - ELEKTRONIK, vol. 28, no. 11, May 31, 1979, München, B. MAVITY, T.C. MC CARTHY "Magnetblasenspeicer-Bausteine und Systeme , Page 45-52 | [ ] - I. RUGE "Halbleiter-Technologie", 1975, SPRINGER VERLAG, Berlin, Heidelberg, New York, Page 256 | [ ] - A.H. ESCHENFELDER "Magnetic Bubble Technology", 1980, SPRINGER VERLAG, Berlin, Heidelberg, New York, Pages 240-244, 250-254 |