EP0069441 - Apparatus for speeding the response of an air bag inflator at low temperatures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1983/02] | Method of and apparatus for speeding the response of an air bag inflator at low temperatures | ||
[1986/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.1987 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.07.1987 [1987/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MORTON THIOKOL, INC. 110 North Wacker Drive Chicago Illinois 60606-1560 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/43] | For all designated states MORTON THIOKOL, INC. 110 North Wacker Drive Chicago Illinois 60606-1560 / US | ||
Former [1983/02] | For all designated states THIOKOL CORPORATION P.O. Box 1000 Newtown Pennsylvania 18940 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Davis, Leland E. 528 Highland Boulevard Brigham City Utah / US | 02 /
Schneiter, Fred E. 2868 N. 150 West North Ogden Utah 84404 / US | 03 /
Dahle, David P. 277 W. 10th North Logan Utah 84321 / US | 04 /
Kirchoff, George F. 527 S. 700 West Brigham City Utah 84302 / US | [1983/02] | Representative(s) | Warren, Anthony Robert, et al Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith London W6 0LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/43] | Warren, Anthony Robert, et al BARON & WARREN, 18 South End, Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | ||
Former [1983/02] | Warren, Francis Charles Baron & Warren 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 82301940.1 | 15.04.1982 | [1983/02] | Priority number, date | US19810257285 | 24.04.1981 Original published format: US 257285 | [1983/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0069441 | Date: | 12.01.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0069441 | Date: | 21.09.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0069441 | Date: | 23.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/26, F42B3/04 | [1986/30] | CPC: |
B60R21/2644 (EP,US);
F42B3/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1983/02] | B60R21/08, F42B3/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1983/02] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Beschleunigung des Aufblasens eines Luftkissens bei niedrigen Temperaturen | [1986/30] | English: | Apparatus for speeding the response of an air bag inflator at low temperatures | [1986/30] | French: | Appareil pour accélérer le gonflage d'un sac à air basses températures | [1986/30] |
Former [1983/02] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung um das Aufblasen eines Luftkissens bei niedrigen Temperaturen zu beschleunigen | ||
Former [1983/02] | Method of and apparatus for speeding the response of an air bag inflator at low temperatures | ||
Former [1983/02] | Procédé et appareil pour accélérer le gonflage d'un sac à air à basses températures | Examination procedure | 13.03.1984 | Examination requested [1984/21] | 15.04.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.01.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.04.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4200615 (GARNER EUGENE F [US], et al); | [YPD]US4296084 (ADAMS GARY V, et al); | [A]US3897962 (SACK JOHN J); | [A]US3773352 (RADKE D); | [A]US4018457 (MARLOW DARRELL W); | [AD]US3972545 (KIRCHOFF GEORGE F, et al) | Examination | EP0012626 |