EP0063953 - Bacillus cloning vectors, recombinant DNA molecules, bacillus hosts transformed with them and methods for expressing foreign DNA sequences and producing polypeptides coded thereby [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.1986 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIOGEN N.V. 15 Pietermaai Willemstad Curacao, Netherlands Antilles / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1982/44] | For all designated states BIOGEN N.V. 15 Pietermaai Willemstad Curacao, Netherlands Antilles / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hardy, Kimber Graham 3 Rue Voltaire CH-1202 Geneva / CH | 02 /
Bingham, Allistair Harold Arthur 277 Route de Thonon 1246 Corsier Geneva / CH | [2007/32] |
Former [1982/49] | 01 /
Hardy, Kimber Graham 3 Rue Voltaire CH-1202 Geneva / CH | ||
02 /
Bingham, Allistair Harold Arthur 277 Route de Thonon 1246 Corsier CH-1227 Carouge / CH | |||
Former [1982/44] | 01 /
Hardy, Kimber Graham 3 Rue Voltaire CH-1202 Geneva / CH | ||
02 /
Bingham, Allistair Harold Arthur 12 Route des Acacias CH-1227 Carouge / CH | Representative(s) | Hartley, David, et al Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London, EC1N 2JT / GB | [1982/44] | Application number, filing date | 82302157.1 | 27.04.1982 | [1982/44] | Priority number, date | GB19810013253 | 29.04.1981 Original published format: GB 8113253 | [1982/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0063953 | Date: | 03.11.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0063953 | Date: | 19.10.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/00, C12P21/00, // C12R1/07 | [1982/44] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP);
C07K14/56 (EP);
C12N15/75 (EP);
C12N2730/10122 (EP);
C12N2770/32122 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/44] | Title | German: | Bacillus-Klonierungsvektoren, rekombinante DNA-Moleküle, damit transformierte Bacilluswirte und Verfahren zur Expression fremder DNA-Sequenzen und zur Herstellung von dadurch kodierten Polypeptiden | [1982/44] | English: | Bacillus cloning vectors, recombinant DNA molecules, bacillus hosts transformed with them and methods for expressing foreign DNA sequences and producing polypeptides coded thereby | [1982/44] | French: | Vecteurs de clonage de bacillus, molécules de DNA recombinant, hôtes de bacillus transformés par celles-ci et méthode pour l'expression de séquences de DNA étrangères et pour la production de polypeptides codés par ce DNA | [1982/44] | File destroyed: | 03.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 12.04.1984 | Examination requested [1984/25] | 11.07.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/20] | 06.12.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1986/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1985 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0021468 (GIST BROCADES NV [NL]); | [XP]EP0036259 (CETUS CORP [US]); | [E]GB2091268 (PALVA ILKKA); | [E]EP0057496 (HEALTH LAB SERVICE BOARD [GB]); | [E]EP0063494 (CETUS CORP [US]) | [X] - JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, vol. 145, no. 1, January 1981, pages 422-428, | [XP] - NATURE, vol. 293, no. 5832, 8th October 1981, pages 481-483, Chesham, Bucks, G.B. |