EP0065844 - Process for stripping uranium from an alkyl pyrophosphoric acid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.1986 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PRODECO, INC. P.O. Box 765 Mulberry Florida 33860 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/48] | For all designated states PRODECO, INC. P.O. Box 765 Mulberry Florida 33860 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Worthington, Ralph Eric 579, Alachua Drive Winter Haven Florida 33880 / US | 02 /
Magdics, Alex 504, Laurel Hill Lakeland Florida 33803 / US | [1982/48] | Representative(s) | Whalley, Kevin, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/48] | Whalley, Kevin, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 82302393.2 | 11.05.1982 | [1982/48] | Priority number, date | US19810267473 | 27.05.1981 Original published format: US 267473 | [1982/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0065844 | Date: | 01.12.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0065844 | Date: | 27.11.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C22B60/02, C01G43/00 | [1982/48] | CPC: |
C22B60/026 (EP,US);
C22B60/02 (KR);
Y02P10/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1982/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Strippen von Uran aus Alkylpyrophosphorsäure | [1982/48] | English: | Process for stripping uranium from an alkyl pyrophosphoric acid | [1982/48] | French: | Procédé d'extraction d'uranium d'un acide alkyle pyro-phosphorique | [1982/48] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 27.05.1983 | Examination requested [1983/32] | 18.06.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.05.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.08.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 27.11.1985 | SE | 30.11.1985 | BE | 31.05.1986 | [2007/44] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 27.11.1985 | |
SE | 30.11.1985 | ||
BE | 31.05.1986 | ||
Former [1991/51] | SE | 30.11.1985 | |
BE | 31.05.1986 | ||
Former [1989/08] | SE | 30.11.1985 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US2866680 (LONG RAY S) |