EP0065875 - Method and apparatus for applying a band of liquid adhesive [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/48] | Method and apparatus for use in applying a band of liquid adhesive | ||
[1986/08] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.1986 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.02.1987 [1987/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states USM Corporation 426 Colt Highway Farmington Connecticut 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/48] | For all designated states USM Corporation 426 Colt Highway Farmington Connecticut 06032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hanson, Raymond 20 Church Leys Avenue Rearsby Leicester / GB | [1982/48] | Representative(s) | Drury, Peter Lawrence, et al T&N Limited, 5 Riverstone, Middlemarch Business Park,Siskin Drive Coventry CV3 4FJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/48] | Drury, Peter Lawrence, et al Emhart Patents Department Lyn House 39 The Parade Oadby, Leicester LE2 5BB / GB | Application number, filing date | 82302599.4 | 21.05.1982 | [1982/48] | Priority number, date | GB19810015976 | 26.05.1981 Original published format: GB 8115976 | [1982/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0065875 | Date: | 01.12.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0065875 | Date: | 19.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B05D1/26, B05C5/02, A43D25/18 | [1982/48] | CPC: |
A43D25/183 (EP,US);
B05C5/02 (EP,US);
B05D1/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1982/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Aufbringen eines Streifens eines flüssigen Klebstoffes | [1986/08] | English: | Method and apparatus for applying a band of liquid adhesive | [1986/08] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour l'application d'une bande d'un adhésif liquide | [1986/08] |
Former [1982/48] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung anwendbar beim Aufbringen eines Streifens eines flüssigen Klebstoffes | ||
Former [1982/48] | Method and apparatus for use in applying a band of liquid adhesive | ||
Former [1982/48] | Procédé et appareil pour usage dans l'application d'une bande d'un adhésif liquide | Examination procedure | 23.05.1983 | Examination requested [1983/32] | 05.04.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.08.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.11.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2069256 (MACKENZIE WILBUR L); | [A]US2100341 (MACKENZIE WILBUR L); | [A]FR2263040 (USM CORP [US]); | [A]US3628500 (MATLOCK GORDON E); | [A]US2294472 (MACKENZIE WILBUR L) |