Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
06.07.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.08.1987 [1987/35] |
05.07.1986 | (Expected) grant | published on 20.08.1986 [1986/34] |
11.08.1984 | Change - applicant | published on 17.10.1984 [1984/42] |
03.07.1984 | Change - applicant | published on 05.09.1984 [1984/36] |
20.06.1983 | Request for examination filed | published on 24.08.1983 [1983/34] |
22.10.1982 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 22.12.1982 [1982/51] |