EP0067563 - Secondary arc extinction device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.1987 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.08.1987 [1987/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/42] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1984/36] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210 / JP | ||
Former [1982/51] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takanashi, Tomio c/o Patent Division Toshiba Corporation 72, Horikawa-cho Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1982/51] | Representative(s) | Kirk, Geoffrey Thomas, et al BATCHELLOR, KIRK & CO. 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/51] | Kirk, Geoffrey Thomas, et al BATCHELLOR, KIRK & CO. 2 Pear Tree Court Farringdon Road London EC1R 0DS / GB | Application number, filing date | 82302651.3 | 24.05.1982 | [1982/51] | Priority number, date | JP19810082128 | 29.05.1981 Original published format: JP 8212881 | [1982/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0067563 | Date: | 22.12.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0067563 | Date: | 20.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.1982 | Classification | IPC: | H02H9/08 | [1982/51] | CPC: |
H02H9/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, LI, SE [1982/51] | Title | German: | Sekundärlichtbogenlöscheinrichtung | [1982/51] | English: | Secondary arc extinction device | [1982/51] | French: | Dispositif d'étouffement pour un arc secondaire | [1982/51] | Examination procedure | 03.06.1983 | Examination requested [1983/34] | 28.08.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.01.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.11.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.01.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 02.01.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.05.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]SU702447 ; | [Y]SU672700 | [X] - "SOVIET INVENTIONS ILLUSTRATED" Week C 30, 3 September 1980; & SU-A-702447, & SU702447 A 00000000 | [Y] - "SOVIET INVENTIONS ILLUSTRATED" Week C 15, 21 May 1980; & SU-A-672700, & SU672700 A 00000000 | Examination | US2824978 | US2050082 |