EP0067005 - Fog prevention [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.1984 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JOHN THURLEY LIMITED Ripon Road Harrogate North Yorkshire HG1 2BU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/50] | For all designated states JOHN THURLEY LIMITED Ripon Road Harrogate North Yorkshire HG1 2BU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thurley, John 34 Cavendish Avenue Harrogate North Yorkshire / GB | [1982/50] | Representative(s) | Harrison, Michael Robert, et al URQUHART-DYKES & LORD 5th Floor, Tower House Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA West Yorkshire / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/43] | Harrison, Michael Robert, et al URQUHART-DYKES & LORD 5th Floor Tower House Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA West Yorkshire / GB | ||
Former [1982/50] | Harrison, Michael Robert Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 5th Floor Tower House Merrion Way Leeds, LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 82302673.7 | 25.05.1982 | [1982/50] | Priority number, date | GB19810016510 | 29.05.1981 Original published format: GB 8116510 | [1982/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0067005 | Date: | 15.12.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/26, F17C7/04, F23J15/00 | [1982/50] | CPC: |
B01D53/265 (EP);
F17C9/02 (EP);
F23J15/06 (EP);
F17C2223/0161 (EP);
F17C2227/0302 (EP);
F17C2227/0337 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, IT, NL, SE [1982/50] | Title | German: | Nebelverhütung | [1982/50] | English: | Fog prevention | [1982/50] | French: | Prévention du brouillard | [1982/50] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 19.04.1983 | Examination requested [1983/27] | 13.03.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/06] | 28.08.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1985/06] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.06.1984 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2430585 ; | [A]DE2061435 ; | [A]JPS55147186 | [A] - Patent Abstracts of Japan, Vol. 5, No. 20, 6 February 1981& JP-A-55 147 186 |