Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] |
07.02.1986 | Refusal of application | published on 26.03.1986 [1986/13] |
30.08.1983 | Change - representative | published on 02.11.1983 [1983/44] |
27.06.1983 | Request for examination filed | published on 31.08.1983 [1983/35] |
05.11.1982 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.01.1983 [1983/01] |