EP0067612 - Penicillin derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.1984 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BEECHAM GROUP PLC Beecham House, Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/51] | For all designated states BEECHAM GROUP PLC Beecham House Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Driver, Michael John 25 Broadwood Close Roffey Horsham Sussex / GB | 02 /
Taylor, Andrew William 7 Doods Road Reigate Surrey / GB | [1982/51] | Representative(s) | Hesketh, Alan, et al European Patent Attorney Beecham Pharmaceuticals Great Burgh Yew Tree Bottom Road Epsom, Surrey, KT18 5XQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/51] | Hesketh, Alan, Dr., et al European Patent Attorney Beecham Pharmaceuticals Great Burgh Yew Tree Bottom Road Epsom, Surrey, KT18 5XQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 82302824.6 | 02.06.1982 | [1982/51] | Priority number, date | GB19810018109 | 12.06.1981 Original published format: GB 8118109 | [1982/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0067612 | Date: | 22.12.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C07D499/00, A61K31/43, // C07D239/48 | [1982/51] | CPC: |
C07D239/48 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
C07D499/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1982/51] | Title | German: | Penicillinderivate | [1982/51] | English: | Penicillin derivatives | [1982/51] | French: | Dérivés de pénicilline | [1982/51] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 26.01.1983 | Examination requested [1983/15] | 03.03.1984 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1984/20] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3487074 (SHEEHAN JOHN CLARK); | [A]EP0003814 (THOMAE GMBH DR K [DE]); | [AP]EP0043205 (BEECHAM GROUP PLC [GB]) |