EP0067722 - A method of producing a photoelectric conversion layer and a method of producing an image pickup device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.1986 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.12.1986 [1986/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1982/51] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takasaki, Yukio 1-47-3-F404 Akatsuki-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Shimomoto, Yasuharu 2196-92 Hirai Hinodemachi Nishitama-gun Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Tanaka, Yasuo 1-217 Higashi-koigakubo Kokubunji-shi Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Sasano, Akira 2196-450 Hirai Hinodemachi Nishitama-gun Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Tsukuda, Toshihisa 4-kou 704-17-B405 Sakimachi Nerima-ku Tokyo / JP | [1982/51] | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/51] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 82303138.0 | 16.06.1982 | [1982/51] | Priority number, date | JP19810092300 | 17.06.1981 Original published format: JP 9230081 | [1982/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0067722 | Date: | 22.12.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0067722 | Date: | 23.03.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0067722 | Date: | 15.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.1983 | Classification | IPC: | H01J29/36, H01L31/18 | [1982/51] | CPC: |
H01J9/233 (EP,US);
H01L31/08 (EP,KR,US);
H01L31/04 (KR);
Y02E10/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1982/51] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer photoelektrischen Konversionsschicht sowie Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Bildaufnahme-Einrichtung | [1982/51] | English: | A method of producing a photoelectric conversion layer and a method of producing an image pickup device | [1982/51] | French: | Méthode pour la production d'une couche de conversion photo-électrique et méthode pour la production d'un dispositif de prise de vues | [1986/03] |
Former [1982/51] | Une méthode pour la production d'une couche de conversion photo-électrique et une méthode pour la production d'un dispositif de prise de vues | Examination procedure | 30.07.1982 | Examination requested [1982/51] | 10.05.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.11.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.07.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.10.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2824564 (THOMSON CSF); | [AD]US4255686 (MARUYAMA EIICHI, et al) | Examination | EP0045203 |