EP0068756 - Brushless DC motors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.1984 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CRANFIELD INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY Cranfield, Bedford MK43 0AL / GB | [1983/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thomas, David Kenneth 4 Alexandra Court Rothschild Road Leighton Buzzard Bedfordshire LU7 7SZ / GB | 02 /
Bugge, John Fawcett Roden No. 1 The Old Vicarage Old Vicarage Lane Dunston Stafford Staffordshire, ST18 9AB / GB | [1983/01] | Representative(s) | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/01] | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 82303184.4 | 18.06.1982 | [1983/01] | Priority number, date | GB19810019600 | 25.06.1981 Original published format: GB 8119600 | [1983/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0068756 | Date: | 05.01.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.11.1982 | Classification | IPC: | H02P6/02 | [1983/01] | CPC: |
H02P6/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1983/01] | Title | German: | Kollektorloser Gleichstrommotor | [1983/01] | English: | Brushless DC motors | [1983/01] | French: | Moteur à courant continu sans collecteur | [1983/01] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 30.09.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1984/11] | 12.12.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1984/11] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1572586 ; | [A]DE2915987 ; | [A]DE3021864 ; | [A]US4008425 ; | [A]FR2302620 ; | [A]FR2266364 ; | [A]FR2062601 |